Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/15/2021 at 15:46:31 (UTC).

Paris Simmons vs. Denise Offley

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Paris Simmons filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Denise Offley. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0019

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simmons, Paris

Mckinney, TX 75071

Defendant

Offley, Denise

Mckinney, TX 75070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Before The Court for JP's; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketEmail Sent to Party; Comments: to all parties - Letting them know case has been removed from docket - will be reset when in person trial is allowed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketE-Mailed Notice of Trial to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSet for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Before The Court for JP's; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Granted; Comments: Plt family emergency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: Plt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketE-Mailed Notice of Trial to All Parties; Comments: In Person Trial requested - 10/21 @ 10 amMailed Notice per Def Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketTrial by Judge; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDefendant E-Mail Address Received; Comments: deniseoffley@gmail.com - Def asked that the hearing notice also be mailed.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Simmons, Paris; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-000649-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less