This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/17/2021 at 14:14:27 (UTC).

Parc at Wylie Apartment vs. Briana Grant,Terri Grant

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Parc at Wylie Apartment filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Briana Grant,Terri Grant. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0125

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parc at Wylie Apartment

1315 W Brown St

Wylie, TX 75098

Defendants

Grant, Terri

Wylie, TX 75098

Grant, Briana

Wylie, TX 75098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMailed Original Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Parc at Wylie Apartment; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01336-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less