This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 09/18/2020 at 03:19:20 (UTC).

Pamela Whipple vs. Kyle K Shaw and Kyle K. Shaw, PLLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 Pamela Whipple filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kyle K Shaw and Kyle K Shaw, PLLC. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Benjamin N. and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Benjamin N.

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Whipple, Pamela

Celeste, TX 75442

Defendants

Kyle K. Shaw, PLLC

Kyle K, Shaw, Pllc, 1333 West Mcdermott Drive, Suite 150

Allen, TX 75013

Shaw, Kyle K

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Norman H Ewert

Defendant Attorney

Kyle K Shaw

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Final Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Ann/Appearance; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Final Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Time: 3:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Final Summary Judgment; Comments: by video-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Judgment Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketOrder for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance, Motion to Extend and Amend Scheduling Order and Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketAppearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: by submission-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Return; Comments: Kyle K. Shaw, PLLC - Civil Citation - Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $464.00, Payments: $464.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($464.00); Payor: Whipple, Pamela Joyce; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02897-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $464.00, Payments: $464.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $150.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $464.00, Payments: $464.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $16.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $464.00, Payments: $464.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $298.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketConstable Service Fee #3, $75.00; Comments: x2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00; Comments: x2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less