This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 09/05/2020 at 02:51:32 (UTC).

Paesano's Restaurant, Inc. vs. Paesanos Paesanos, Inc.and Alan Tovi, individually

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Paesano's Restaurant, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Paesanos Paesanos, Inc and Alan Tovi, individually. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Benjamin N. and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Benjamin N.

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paesano's Restaurant, Inc.

Leboeuf Law, Pllc, 325 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

Tovi, Alan

Plano, TX 75093

Paesanos Paesanos, Inc.

Reg.Agent,Alan Tovi, 508 E.14Th Street

Plano, TX 75074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole T. Leboeuf

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Ann/Appearance; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: by submission- Plaintiff's MSJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Mtn/default set on submission and GRANTED. Movant requested to e-file proposed judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDefault; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: by submission- per Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDefault; Time: 10:30 AM; Comments: by video- Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Scheduled Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order; Comments: Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Submission on Plaintiff's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Alan Tovi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: Plaintiff's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Alan Tovi

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Paesanos Inc. - Civil Citation- Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Alan Tovi - Civil Citation- Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1.00, Payments: $1.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($16.00); Payor: Paesano's Restaurant, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03362-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1.00, Payments: $1.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $16.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1.00, Payments: $1.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($298.00); Payor: Paesano's Restaurant, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03315-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $1.00, Payments: $1.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $298.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: To Ms. Finley Re: Issuance of Citations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less