This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/03/2020 at 05:47:03 (UTC).

Oportun Inc vs. Irma Pena

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Irma Pena. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0715

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc

Po Box 560880

The Colony, TX 75056

Defendant

Pena, Irma

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketBench Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketExhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Motion Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNote; Comments: No certificate of last known address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: PS $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $2,899.15;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Oportun Inc; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03091-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant