Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 01/16/2021 at 01:18:19 (UTC).

OneMain Financial Group, LLC VS. Senthil Kumar

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 OneMain Financial Group, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Senthil Kumar. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Walker, Barnett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Walker, Barnett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OneMain Financial Group, LLC

Morgan & Associates, P.C., 2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Kumar, Senthil

Plano, TX 75025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Crystal Griffin

Defendant Attorney

James Heston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Cause Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCause Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Plaintiff's counsel had two TBCs set for today.They have failed to respond to opposing counsel, failed to appear for Court, and failed to request a continuance.This happens with such regularity that the Court is dismissing this case with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDiscovery Control Plan & Scheduling Order; Comments: signed by Judge Walker TBC 8-20-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCourt Administrator's Comments; Comments: Notice of pre-trial hearing mailed of 4/16/2020 at 1:30 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPrivate Process Server; Comments: $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: 1-22-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketE-Served through E-Filing Portal; Comments: Env #39745705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: OneMain Financial Group, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-00057-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation Pre Judgment - $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest; Comments: for issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Contract Consumer/Commer/Debt (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Heston