This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 09:54:30 (UTC).

Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC v. Jose A. Hernandez-Parra

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Oncor Electric Delivery Company, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Jose A Hernandez-Parra. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC

1700 Pacific Ave., Suite 3740

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant

Hernandez-Parra, Jose A.

Mckinney, TX 75071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin B Wiggins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $396.00, Payments: $396.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-00024-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $396.00, Payments: $396.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $80.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Reinstate - Civil$80.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Reinstate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service; Comments: Motion for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: DWOP Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Jose A. Hernandez-Parra - Citation- Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $396.00, Payments: $396.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($316.00); Payor: Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-16375-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $396.00, Payments: $396.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $316.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Cover Letter and Request for Citation Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC is a litigant