This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 01/29/2020 at 00:20:48 (UTC).

Obie Rigmaiden,Cathy Liu vs. Mark Dabney,Paul Sherrod

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Obie Rigmaiden,Cathy Liu filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mark Dabney,Paul Sherrod. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0277

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Liu, Cathy

Plano, TX 75074

Rigmaiden, Obie

Plano, TX 75074

Defendants

Sherrod, Paul

Plano, TX 75075

Dabney, Mark

Plano, TX 75075

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMailed Signed Dismissal to Each Side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Dismissed per Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketDismissed per Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comments: by Mark Dabney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served; Comments: Both defendants served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $196.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($196.00); Payor: Rigmaiden, Obie; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001398-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $196.00, Payments: $196.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less