This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/07/2021 at 13:16:17 (UTC).

Newsome Homes, LP vs. Tommy Williams

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Newsome Homes, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tommy Williams. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0620

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newsome Homes, LP

The Suster Law Group, Pllc, 1316 Village Creek Drive, Suite 500

Plano, TX 75093-4461

Defendant

Williams, Tommy

Mckinney, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Newsome Homes, LP; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-003690-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Comments: Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketLetter from Attorney; Comments: Pltff- Transmittal to Defendant serving signed judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketE-Mailed Notice of Trial to Plaintiff; Comments: with zoom link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Attorney Costs; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Newsome Homes, LP; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-003272-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Forcible Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newsome Homes, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster