This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/15/2021 at 04:27:12 (UTC).

Newsome Homes, LP vs. Deborah McLaurin and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Newsome Homes, LP filed an Other lawsuit against Deborah McLaurin and All Occupants. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Mason, Corinne A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Mason, Corinne A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newsome Homes, LP

The Suster Law Group, Pllc, 1316 Village Creek Drive, Suite 500

Plano, TX 75093-4461

Defendant

McLaurin, Deborah

Mckinney, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Defendant Attorney

Jason L Riddle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNo Action Taken; Comments: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEviction Trial; Time: 9:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Comments: Appearance of Co-Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: of Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertified Green Card Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($322.00); Payor: Suster, Israel L.; Receipt: Receipt # CC-CV-03116-2020; Description: Mail - Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $322.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketJP Appeal Letter for filing fee w/ certified mail receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket8 Day Answer Letter; Comments: Mailed to All Parties in Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketJustice of the Peace Appeal Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appealed Case from Lower Court (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newsome Homes, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster