This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 01/15/2021 at 12:45:56 (UTC).

Newsome Homes, LP vs. Deborah McLaurin

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Newsome Homes, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Deborah McLaurin. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0601

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newsome Homes, LP

The Suster Law Group, Pllc, 1316 Village Creek Drive, Suite 500

Plano, TX 75093-4461

Defendant

McLaurin, Deborah

Mckinney, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Defendant Attorney

Jason L Riddle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCounty Court at Law Letter; Comments: 001-01804-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCounty Court at Law Letter; Comments: fees need to be paid to CC@L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketAppealed to CCL (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertification of Transcript; Judge: Raleeh, Paul M.; Comments: THE STATE OF TEXAS COUNTY OF COLLINJUSTICE COURT 1I hereby certify that the attached 43 pages are true and exact copies of the official court records for case number 01-EV-20-00601Witnessed my hand and official seal at the Court in McKinney, Collin County Texas08/04/2020By Any C. Alvarado Justice Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketBond Approved by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPosted Cash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketAppeal Bond Filed by Attorney; Comments: for the Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketLetter from Attorney; Comments: Cover letter from Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appeal; Comments: filed by Pltff Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed by Attorney; Comments: LANWT's Notice of Appearance; Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Newsome Homes, LP; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-003102-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketE-Mailed Notice of Trial to Plaintiff; Comments: with zoom link

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Forcible Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newsome Homes, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster