This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/17/2020 at 08:45:07 (UTC).

Newsome Homes LP, dba Newsome Homes vs. Shawn McClelland

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Newsome Homes LP, dba Newsome Homes filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Shawn McClelland. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0821

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newsome Homes LP, dba Newsome Homes

6300 La Calma Dr , Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

McClelland, Shawn

Mckinney, TX 75069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Newsome Homes LP, dba Newsome Homes; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-003090-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice to Plaintiff; Comments: Emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newsome Homes, LP is a litigant