This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/26/2020 at 00:37:33 (UTC).

Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. vs. Wesley Gerhardt

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Wesley Gerhardt. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0085

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.

4851 Lbj Freeway, Suite 750

Dallas, TX 75244

Defendant

Gerhardt, Wesley

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharon H Sjostrom

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $241.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$180.00; Transactions: Amount: $180.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Comments: Special Writ of possession to enforce judgment for personal property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $241.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$180.00; Transactions: Amount: ($10.00); Payor: Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-00333-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $241.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$180.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Comments: Letter to clerk requesting Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 11/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $4,829.93;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $241.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$180.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02471-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $241.00, Payments: $61.00, Balance:$180.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less