This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/17/2021 at 14:21:09 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Raul Bustamante

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Raul Bustamante. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1021

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

Bustamante, Raul

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Newman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketOrder Signed; Comments: granting 501.2 -emailed to abc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,585.26;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Midland Funding LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03417-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Newman