This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 06/22/2019 at 15:43:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. LUKE HENSLEY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUKE HENSLEY. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0106

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

HENSLEY, LUKE

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Young

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Dismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 1:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Motion for Dismissal; Comments: W/O PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Citation Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DWOP Hearing; Comments: JUNE 14, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Debt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: EMAILED - EFILING@PCPUSA.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Debt Claim Petition; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH ATTACHMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00318-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $2,817.37;

    Read MoreRead Less