Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/07/2020 at 00:33:32 (UTC).

Mickey Martin,Kenneth Barnes vs. Maria Arreguin

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Mickey Martin,Kenneth Barnes filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maria Arreguin. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0397

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barnes, Kenneth

Mckinney, TX 75070

Martin, Mickey

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

Arreguin, Maria Esther

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Taeri Oh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketTrial by Jury; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJury Panel Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketJury Panel Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Trial to All Parties; Comments: jury 4/9 @10am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $22.00, Payments: $22.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($22.00); Payor: Arreguin, Maria Esther; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-008295-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $22.00, Payments: $22.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $22.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJury Trial Requested; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $22.00, Payments: $22.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Martin, Mickey; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-007812-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $22.00, Payments: $22.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $22.00, Payments: $22.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Pct 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taeri Oh