This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/09/2020 at 15:30:37 (UTC).

Michael Anderson,Kristan Anderson vs. Timothy Roberts,Shirley Roberts

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Michael Anderson,Kristan Anderson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Timothy Roberts,Shirley Roberts. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0075

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anderson, Michael

Lucas, TX 75002

Anderson, Kristan

Lucas, TX 75002

Defendants

Roberts, Shirley J

Wylie, TX 75098

Roberts, Timothy W

Wylie, TX 75098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 10/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketAddress Updated for Defendant; Comments: to address on answer form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comments: Timothy Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comments: Shirley Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Timothy Roberts and Shirley Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $201.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($201.00); Payor: Anderson, Michael; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-02414-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $150.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less