Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 16:02:48 (UTC).

Merritt McGowan Manor, LP vs. Abraham Kalokoh

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Merritt McGowan Manor, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Abraham Kalokoh. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0089

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merritt McGowan Manor, LP

The Suster Law Group, Pllc, 1316 Village Creek Drive, Suite 500

Plano, TX 75093-4461

Defendant

Kalokoh, Abraham

Mckinney, TX 75069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($180.00); Payor: Merritt McGowan Manor, LP; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-001744-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $180.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Kalokoh, Abraham Type: WRIT OF POSSESSION -EVICTION; Origin: Precinct 1; Paper No: C1-21-000895; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketLetter from Attorney; Comments: Transmittal to Defendant serving signed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest Rule 510.4c

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Attorney Costs; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketE-Mailed Hearing Notice to Plaintiff; Comments: with zoom meeting id; 923 7861 8498

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Merritt McGowan Manor, LP; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-000953-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $301.00, Payments: $301.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition for Forcible Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less