Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 01/14/2021 at 10:53:20 (UTC).

MD MONWAR ALI vs. ACCELERATE MOTORSPORTS

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 MD MONWAR ALI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ACCELERATE MOTORSPORTS. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0398

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALI, MD MONWAR

Wylie, TX 75098

Defendant

ACCELERATE MOTORSPORTS

Dallas, TX 75229

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $206.00, Payments: $206.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($155.00); Payor: ALI, MD MONWAR; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-003663-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $206.00, Payments: $206.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $155.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Requested and Paid For

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $206.00, Payments: $206.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: ALI, MD MONWAR; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-007861-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $206.00, Payments: $206.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less