Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 11/17/2020 at 03:14:28 (UTC).

McKinney OB-GYN Lawrence S. Pierce, M.D. vs. Sara Underwood

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 McKinney OB-GYN Lawrence S Pierce, M D filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sara Underwood. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0408

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McKinney OB-GYN Lawrence S. Pierce, M.D.

5236 W University Dr , Ste 3150

Mckinney, TX 75071

Defendant

Underwood, Sara

Allen, TX 75013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff Failed to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: No Show

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice to Plaintiff; Comments: DWOP 9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketBad Address Letter Sent to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketBad Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: McKinney OB-GYN Lawrence S. Pierce, M.D.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-008241-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McKinney OB-GYN Lawrence S. Pierce, M.D. is a litigant