This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 01/30/2020 at 04:32:46 (UTC).

Mariner Finance vs. Mary Camacho

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Mariner Finance filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mary Camacho. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0113

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariner Finance

3115 W. Parker Rd., Ste. 350

Plano, TX 75023

Defendant

Camacho, Mary

Frisco, TX 75034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProve-up Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing; Comments: TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing; Comments: TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCIVIL Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $121.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Mariner Finance; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001122-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $121.00, Payments: $121.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less