This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 04/15/2020 at 15:19:27 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Wayne Williams

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wayne Williams. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2008

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Defendant

Williams, Wayne

Plano, TX 75023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vince Handler

Michael J. Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Motion Hearing; Time: 11:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: PS $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $2,113.62;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: LVNV Funding LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2018-08942-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition; Comments: efile stamped 1/2/2019 should have been 12/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less