This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 10/14/2019 at 15:57:54 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Traci Sims

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Traci Sims. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Sims, Traci D

Plano, TX 75025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vince Handler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Mail Returned; Comments: for def

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Bench Note; Comments: def no show

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Civil Motion Hearing; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Mail Notice to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Certificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Civil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • No Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Debt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: LVNV Funding LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00578-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $3,381.35;

    Read MoreRead Less