This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/09/2021 at 12:45:19 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Nicole Rolon

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nicole Rolon. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0687

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Rolon, Nicole

Allen, TX 75013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketRelease of Judgment; Comments: Notice of SOJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Response; Comments: AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Response; Comments: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Response; Comments: Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: PS $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,238.07;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: Lvnv Funding Llc; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-03059-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul