This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 15:53:26 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Johnny Gibson Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Johnny Gibson Jr. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0638

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Scott & Associates, P.C., P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Gibson Jr., Johnny J

Mckinney, TX 75072

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Private Processor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Lvnv Funding Llc; Receipt: Receipt # 2021-001558-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul