This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 02/14/2021 at 14:23:02 (UTC).

Lvnv Funding Llc vs. Jennifer Taylor

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Lvnv Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jennifer Taylor. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0739

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Taylor, Jennifer

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Kirkendall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment; Comments: Motion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted; Comments: emailed to process server

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketEmail; Comments: citation and petition sent to process server per filer request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Lvnv Funding Llc; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-01969-JP2; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Kirkendall