This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 08/29/2019 at 15:11:47 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Bruce Johnson

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bruce Johnson. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0142

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Johnson, Bruce A

Prosper, TX 75078

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathanial D Kitz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Dismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 1:00 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Order to be Forthcoming

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Mailed; Comments: TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DWOP Hearing; Comments: JUNE 7, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Return of Service Filed; Comments: SERVED 1.22.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Debt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: EMAILED - MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Debt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: LVNV Funding LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00482-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less