This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/16/2021 at 04:45:30 (UTC).

Love That Door, LLC vs. Timothy Chad Crenshaw

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Love That Door, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Timothy Chad Crenshaw. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Tucker, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Tucker, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Love That Door, LLC

60 Village Lane, Suite 110

Colleyville, TX 76034

Defendant

Crenshaw, Timothy Chad

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Welch

Vale Krenik

David J Moraine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $85.00, Payments: $85.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($25.00); Payor: Collin County DC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-16359-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $85.00, Payments: $85.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $25.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketPlea to Jurisdiction; Comments: Plea to the Jurisdiction and Opposition to Untimely Plea in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Comments: Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Designation of Lead Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $85.00, Payments: $85.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: Crenshaw, Mika; Receipt: Receipt # DC-14878-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $85.00, Payments: $85.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $80.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketMotion to Reinstate - Civil$80.00; Comments: Plea in Intervention and Motion to Reinstate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Release Cash Bond; Comments: Order to Release Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Release Cash Bond; Comments: Motion to Release Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Notice; Comments: Notice of Funds in the Registry

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Cash Deposit in Lieu of Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Comments: Order for Issuance of Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Application for Temporary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketBond Application Fee Collected $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Temporary Injunction $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Correspondence Regarding Request for Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCase Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Verified Petition and Application for Ex Parte, Temporary and Permanent Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less