Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/16/2021 at 14:36:43 (UTC).

Lotus Threading Art & Spa LLC vs. Omnibuild

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Lotus Threading Art Spa LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Omnibuild. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0402

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lotus Threading Art & Spa LLC

14743 Daneway Drive

Frisco, TX 75035

Defendant

Omnibuild

1701 Legacy Drive, # 1400

Frisco, TX 75034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned Nulla Bona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketWrit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Lotus Threading Art & Spa LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-004171-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Requested and Paid For

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $126.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Lotus Threading Art & Spa LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-007962-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $311.00, Payments: $311.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $126.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Omnibuild, LLC is a litigant