This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 08/13/2020 at 01:18:55 (UTC).

LG Acquisitions, LLC vs. Health Plaza, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 LG Acquisitions, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Health Plaza, LLC. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Thompson, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Thompson, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LG Acquisitions, LLC

Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, Llp, 3131 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant

Health Plaza, LLC

By Serving Registered Agent Akash Jain, 17742 Preston Road

Dallas, TX 75252

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan J Wick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Order of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: LG Acquisitions, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02231-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($298.00); Payor: LG Acquisitions, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02166-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $298.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Request for Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less