This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/25/2022 at 15:04:28 (UTC).

Lakes of El Dorado Apartments vs. Miriam Perkins,Dedrick Perkins

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Lakes of El Dorado Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Miriam Perkins,Dedrick Perkins. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0276

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakes of El Dorado Apartments

1400 El Dorado Pwky

Mckinney, TX 75069

Defendants

Perkins, Dedrick

Mckinney, TX 75069

Perkins, Miriam

Mckinney, TX 75069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Served; Comments: Dedrick Perkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Served; Comments: Miriam Perkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketE-Mailed Hearing Notice to Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Perkins, Dedrick Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Justice of the Peace Precinct 1; Paper No: C1-22-000993; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $204.00, Payments: $204.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($21.00); Description: State Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $204.00, Payments: $204.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($183.00); Payor: Lakes of El Dorado Apartments; Receipt: Receipt # 2022-001147-JP1; Description: Payment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $204.00, Payments: $204.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $204.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Suit; Comments: Guide and File - Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Papers-: Person to Serve: Perkins, Miriam Type: FORCIBLE; Origin: Justice of the Peace Precinct 1; Paper No: C1-22-000992; Location: PCT 1 Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less