Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/17/2021 at 18:52:16 (UTC).

Kirk Shohan vs. Claudia Georges,Jeffrey Georges

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Kirk Shohan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Claudia Georges,Jeffrey Georges. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Collin County Administration Building located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Raleeh, Paul M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0411

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Administration Building

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Raleeh, Paul M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shohan, Kirk

Mckinney, TX 75069

Defendants

Georges, Claudia

Mckinney, TX 75071

Georges, Jeffrey

Mckinney, TX 75071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment for Plaintiff; Comments: Plt to take possession of Hot Tub ; cc $201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketExhibit List; Comments: Defendant Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketTrial Before The Court for JP's; Time: 10:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketExhibit List; Comments: Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEmail Received; Comments: From email beiterlegalit@gmail. - do not include on any further emails no longer associated with this case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketZoom Hearing; Comments: Link sent to all parties by email.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketE-Mail Sent/Received; Comments: From Plt - regarding trial setting - sent copy of trial notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $201.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($201.00); Payor: Shohan, Kirk; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-008299-JP1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $201.00, Payments: $201.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Service To:; Comments: Collin County Constable Pct 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less