Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 05/18/2020 at 00:29:32 (UTC).

Kent Starr vs. Jeffrey Bednar

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Kent Starr filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jeffrey Bednar. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0343

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Starr, Kent W.

Mckinney, TX 75070

Defendant

Bednar, Jeffrey

Lucas, TX 75002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unexecuted; Comments: recalled by plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketEviction Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($185.00); Payor: Starr, Kent W.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0002087-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $185.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Comments: Application for Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Eviction Granted - Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Returned to Court Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Granted - Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEviction Hearing; Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Possession of Property; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($121.00); Payor: Starr, Kent W.; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001749-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $306.00, Payments: $306.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $121.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued for Eviction (Forcible Detainer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less