This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 06/11/2020 at 04:01:06 (UTC).

Joi Crayton vs. Hashim Mohmand

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Joi Crayton filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hashim Mohmand. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0298

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crayton, Joi

Plano, TX 75074

Defendant

Mohmand, Hashim

Richardson, TX 75081

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketBad Address Letter Sent to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketMailed Citation for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: Dallas Co PCT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $131.00, Payments: $131.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($80.00); Payor: Crayton; Joi; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05912-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $131.00, Payments: $131.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $80.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: to take Crescent off petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $131.00, Payments: $131.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Crayton, Joi; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05570-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $131.00, Payments: $131.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $131.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition; Comments: Claim for reimbursement for locksmith fee due to lockout caused by electrical failure of garage door unit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less