This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 11/16/2019 at 13:25:19 (UTC).

John Sims vs. National Write Your Congressman

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 John Sims filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against National Write Your Congressman. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0117

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sims, John

Murphy, TX 75094

Defendant

National Write Your Congressman

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Carrie B Hoffman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2019
  • Trial by Judge; Time: 9:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Mailed Signed Dismissal to Each Side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Motion Hearing; Time: 1:30 PM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Dismissal Order Signed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Mailed Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Motion for Discovery; Comments: Motion to Compel Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Plaintiff's Response; Comments: Offering of evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Mailed Original Court Order; Comments: to both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • Mailed Notice of Trial to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Original Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Citation Served; Comments: Dallas County Precinct 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2019
  • Citation Issued Out of County Constable; Comments: Dallas County Precinct 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($51.00); Payor: Sims, John; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0002540-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $51.00, Payments: $51.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $51.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $51.00;

    Read MoreRead Less