This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 08/12/2020 at 01:10:09 (UTC).

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC vs. MARK HOGAN

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARK HOGAN. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Missildine, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0134

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Judge

Missildine, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC

Po Box 3968

Lubbock, TX 78452

Defendant

HOGAN, MARK J

Plano, TX 75074-0266

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Moss

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Comments: mailed to both parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Comments: motion for default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting; Comments: Order Retaining Case on Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: P's Mtn to Retain, Order Retaining, and Order Setting Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Hearing; Comments: TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Notice of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • DocketCitation Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted; Comments: and emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e; Comments: Motion For Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued to Private Process Server; Comments: via email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-0001415-JP32; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss