This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 02/14/2021 at 23:41:32 (UTC).

JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC vs. James Dickey

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James Dickey. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgeworth, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Edgeworth, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC

Moss Law Firm, P.C., P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Defendant

Dickey, James

Katy, TX 77491

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Moss

Defendant Attorney

James Heston

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $307.00, Payments: $307.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1.00); Payor: Moss Law Firm PC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-27954-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $307.00, Payments: $307.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketBench Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAgreed Order; Comments: Agreed Order Canceling Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketObjection; Comments: Agreed Objection to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketBench Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketPre Trial; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service- Dickey, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $307.00, Payments: $307.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($306.00); Payor: JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05572-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $307.00, Payments: $307.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $306.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less