This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 04/04/2019 at 18:47:13 (UTC).

JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC vs. Craig Baio

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Craig Baio. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0439

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Frisco Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Yarbrough, W.M. "Mike"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Baio, Craig

Prosper, TX 75078

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • Dismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Motion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DWOP Hearing; Comments: MAY 10TH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Citation Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Civil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Debt Claim Citation - Private Process Server; Comments: emaiked to mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Cause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Debt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Case Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-01755-JP4; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Financial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Dispositions-: Comments: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Cause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Court Costs; Remedy Amount: $46.00;

    Read MoreRead Less