This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 06/24/2020 at 02:08:37 (UTC).

JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC vs. Coe Davis

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Coe Davis. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0157

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Davis, Coe

Plano, TX 75023

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyla Baxter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Default Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Motion Hearing; Time: 11:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: AS $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketAlternative Service Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketRequest Rule 501.2e

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $1,994.55;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00837-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less