This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 13:59:15 (UTC).

Jessica Dahl Hatton and Apex Behavior Services, LLC Plaintiffs, v. Concept Connections, Ltd. Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Jessica Dahl Hatton and Apex Behavior Services, LLC Plaintiffs filed an Other lawsuit against Concept Connections, Ltd Defendant. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Rusch, Mark and Bouressa, Andrea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Rusch, Mark

Bouressa, Andrea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Apex Behavior Services, LLC

Jb Schwartz Pllc, Two Turtle Creek, 3838 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Hatton, Jessica Dahl

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant

Concept Connections, Ltd.

Hedrick Kring, Pllc, 1700 Pacific Ave., Suite 4650

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth M. Cunningham

Defendant Attorney

Joshua L Hedrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketTrial Ann/Appearance; Time: 10:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($10.00); Payor: Collin County District Clerk; Receipt: Receipt # DC-20211-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($10.00); Payor: Collin County District Clerk; Receipt: Receipt # DC-20210-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $10.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Release Cash Bond; Comments: Order Granting Joint Motion to Release Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMotion to Release Cash Bond; Comments: Joint Motion to Release Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMailed; Comments: Notice of Funds in Registry of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $4.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Comments: Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Temporary Injunction Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Cash Deposit in Lieu of Surety Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketBond Application Fee Collected $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($346.00); Payor: Hatton, Jessica Dahl; Receipt: Receipt # DC-08570-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $213.00, Payments: $213.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $346.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Injunctive Relief, and Expedited Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less