This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 03/05/2020 at 14:14:32 (UTC).

Jerri Newton vs. Yan Xu

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Jerri Newton filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Yan Xu. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruckel, Chuck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0309

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Plano Sub-Courthouse Justice Of The Peace

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ruckel, Chuck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newton, Jerri

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant

Xu, Yan

Plano, TX 75075

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth S Harter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketSet for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketBench Note; Comments: Both parties willing to mediate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketMediation Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMediation Hearing; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: about continuance and new court date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Comments: by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMediation Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comments: prefers all correspondence by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: PS $75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: PCT3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $75.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($126.00); Payor: Newton, Jerri; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-05934-JP3-1; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $126.00, Payments: $126.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $126.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNo Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Attorney Costs; Remedy Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less