This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 01/28/2020 at 04:30:47 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs. MICHELE FRAME

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHELE FRAME. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0150

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Collin County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

15660 Dallas, Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

FRAME, MICHELE LEE

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly MacDevitt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketJustice Claim Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Case Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Order Granting of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Notice of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit; Comments: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketJustice Claim Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: Hearing Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketMail Notice to All Parties; Comments: for hearing on 06/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCitation Served; Comments: 02/25/19 Returned to court03/11/19 Answer dateService fee $82.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action-: Remedy Sought: Monetary; Remedy Amount: $576.25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($46.00); Payor: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; Receipt: Receipt # 2019-00600-JP2; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Plaintiff, Charges: $46.00, Payments: $46.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $46.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketReceipts - Received Payment; Comments: Efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Citation; Comments: Emailed to ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCase Filed (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCause Of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less