This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/03/2021 at 03:50:25 (UTC).

Jamie Cortinas vs. Shelia Gayken and Brian Gayken

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Jamie Cortinas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Shelia Gayken and Brian Gayken. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Willis, Jill and Smith, Benjamin N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Willis, Jill

Smith, Benjamin N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cortinas, Jamie

Houston, TX 77006

Defendants

Gayken, Shelia

Wylie, TX 75098

Gayken, Brian

Wylie, TX 75098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donny Joseph

Defendant Attorney

David J. Metzler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Order on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMailed or Faxed or Emailed Order; Comments: Mailed Certified Copy of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Notice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Nonsuit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($40.00); Payor: Gayken, Shelia; Receipt: Receipt # DC-20494-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $40.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Return of Service Affidavit - Citation - Shelia Gayken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Administrative Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 8/31/2020 to transfer to 380th.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($364.00); Payor: Cortinas, Jamie; Receipt: Receipt # DC-17319-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $40.00, Payments: $40.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $364.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketJury Fee Paid $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $313.00; Comments: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Metzler