Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 16:43:31 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Wesley Gliem and Catherine Gliem

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 In the Matter of the Marriage of Wesley Gliem and Catherine Gliem was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gliem, Wesley

Dallas, TX 75231

Respondent

Gliem, Catherine

Mckinney, TX 75070

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Katie L. Lewis

Respondent Attorney

J. Ryan Nordhaus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $335.00, Payments: $335.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Gliem, Wesley; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05269-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $335.00, Payments: $335.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Notice $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $335.00, Payments: $335.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Gliem, Catherine; Receipt: Receipt # DC-04810-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $335.00, Payments: $335.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Original CounterPetition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $335.00, Payments: $335.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($327.00); Payor: Gliem, Wesley; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03794-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $335.00, Payments: $335.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $327.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Wesley Gliem's Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less