Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 16:45:38 (UTC).

In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Vanessa Ann Lopez Petitioner, And Ricardo Lopez, Jr. Respondent. And In The Interest Of B.A.L. And E.M.L., Minor Children

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Vanessa Ann Lopez Petitioner, And Ricardo Lopez, Jr Respondent And In The Interest Of B A L And E M L , Minor Children was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Willis, Jill Renfro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Willis, Jill Renfro

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez, Vanessa Ann

Mckinney, TX 75072

Respondent

Lopez, Ricardo, Jr.

1127 Roman Dr.

Princeton, TX 75407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bryan D Perkins

Brandon Epperson

Respondent Attorney

Dana C. Palmer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $342.00, Payments: $342.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($15.00); Payor: Lopez, Vanessa Ann; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06130-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $342.00, Payments: $342.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $15.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketIssued Employer's Withholding Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Employer's Withholding $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support; Comments: Income Withholding for Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketTemporary Order; Comments: Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate; Comments: Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketGeneral Docket Entry; Comments: Parties appeared with counsel; WSTH; hearing on temporary orders; Mother's requested relief granted; OTBFC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketTemporary Orders Hearing; Time: 1:00 PM; Comments: Petitioner's & Respondent's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition; Comments: Ricardo Lopez, Jr.'s Second Amended Counter-Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $342.00, Payments: $342.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Lopez, Vanessa Ann; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03450-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $342.00, Payments: $342.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAppearance of Counsel; Comments: Entry of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Request for Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2021
  • DocketAdministrative Order; Comments: Order signed 2/7/2021 to transfer to the 429th Court effective 1/31/2021.Order scanned into minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $342.00, Payments: $342.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($319.00); Payor: Lopez, Vanessa Ann; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01784-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $342.00, Payments: $342.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $319.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00; Comments: Original Petition For Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dana C. Palmer