Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 03/17/2021 at 22:54:53 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Susan Fanning Chapman and Tom Smith Chapman and In the Interest of A.G.C. and I.D.C., Children

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Susan Fanning Chapman and Tom Smith Chapman and In the Interest of A G C and I D C , Children was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chapman, Susan Fanning

Mckinney, TX 75069

Respondent

Chapman, Tom Smith

Mckinney, TX 75070

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lynda Landers

Deron L Sugg

Respondent Attorney

Shanin Turner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($8.00); Payor: Chapman, Susan; Receipt: Receipt # DC-20262-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $8.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDismissal for Want of Prosecution; Time: 8:30 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove- Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 Agreement for Final Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Substitute Counsel; Comments: Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Motion for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Chapman, Susan; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02444-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $322.00, Payments: $322.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deron L Sugg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynda Landers