This case was last updated from Collin County District Courts on 06/23/2020 at 00:21:58 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Stephanie Margaret Hunn vs. Shain Timothy Hunn and in the Interest of Hayden Shain Hunn,Riley Margaret Hunn

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Stephanie Margaret Hunn filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Shain Timothy Hunn and in the Interest of Hayden Shain Hunn,Riley Margaret Hunn. This case was filed in Collin County District Courts, Collin County District Courts located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Miskel, Emily. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Collin County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Miskel, Emily

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hunn, Stephanie Margaret

Allen, TX 75013

Respondent

Hunn, Shain Timothy

Dallas, TX 75026

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

George E. Crumley

Respondent Attorney

Kyle G Basinger

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketOrder - Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Notice of Move of Attorney Kyle Basinger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Agreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Not Provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAgreed Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketWaiver of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($304.00); Payor: Hunn, Stephanie Margaret; Receipt: Receipt # DC-08256-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $304.00, Payments: $304.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $304.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less