Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/04/2020 at 09:29:21 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Sewa Stephanie Ettiegne and D'Andre Maurice Mullen

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Sewa Stephanie Ettiegne and D'Andre Maurice Mullen was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ettiegne, Sewa Stephanie

Plano, TX 75025

Respondent

Mullen, D'Andre Maurice

Plano, TX 75025

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Undeliverable; Comments: D'Andre Maurice Mullen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketAustin Form; Comments: Not Provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($1.00); Payor: Ettiegne, Sewa Stephanie; Receipt: Receipt # DC-03073-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $1.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Service; Comments: Waiver of Service - Divorce (No Children)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($316.00); Payor: Assonman Degny; Receipt: Receipt # DC-02535-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $2.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase Information Sheet; Comments: Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00; Comments: Original Petition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less