Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 12/03/2020 at 18:59:48 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Sarkodie Addo vs.Lydia Druscla Lutterodt

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 In the Matter of the Marriage of Sarkodie Addo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Lydia Druscla Lutterodt. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Addo, Sarkodie

Dallas, TX 75247

Respondent

Lutterodt, Lydia Druscla

Dallas, TX 75252

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lawrence Bosompem

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DispositionDispositions-: Comments: Final Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMailed Notice of Final Decree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketFinal Decree of Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketJudge's Docket Entry; Comments: Default Prove-up; Divorce Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketStatement; Comments: Statement of Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDefault; Time: 9:00 AM; Comments: 11:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketStatus Report; Comments: Status Report Pursuant to Servicemembers Civil Relief Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address; Comments: Attorney's Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit of Diligent Search

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketConstable Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($83.00); Payor: Addo, Sarkodie; Receipt: Receipt # DC-06444-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $83.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Citation by Posting $83.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Citation by Publication; Comments: Affidavit for Citation by Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($314.00); Payor: Addo, Sarkodie; Receipt: Receipt # DC-01559-2020; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $397.00, Payments: $397.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $314.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $314.00

    Read MoreRead Less