Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Collin County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 19:46:11 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marriage of Raj Malviya and Neelam Malviya

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 In the Matter of the Marriage of Raj Malviya and Neelam Malviya was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Collin County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wynne, Lindsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Collin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wynne, Lindsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Malviya, Raj

Dallas, TX 75247

Respondent

Malviya, Neelam

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dana Duffey

Chris J Harding

Kathryn Lanigan Pruitt

Respondent Attorney

Diana L. Porter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Before the Court; Time: 9:00 AM; Cancelled Reason: Cancelled: Continuance Granted; Comments: 2.5 hr/side

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder for Continuance; Comments: Agreed Order on Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($65.00); Payor: Malviya, Neelam; Receipt: Receipt # DC-05865-2021; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $65.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAppearance of Counsel; Comments: Notice of Appearance of Lead Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCounter Petition $65.00; Comments: Original Counterpetition for Divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Letter to Court from Mediator - No Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSubpoena Return - Not DC Issued; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Wells Fargo Bank, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSubpoena Return - Not DC Issued; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Wells Wargo Bank, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 Letter Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement; Comments: Rule 11 Agreement Regarding Inventory and Appraisements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Deposition(Bill of Cost Form)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketService Return; Comments: Affidavit of Service - Neelam Malviya - Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOriginal Answer; Comments: Respondent's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($317.00); Payor: Malviya, Raj; Receipt: Receipt # DC-34983-2019; Description: Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Petitioner, Charges: $317.00, Payments: $317.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $317.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Citation $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition for Divorce (OCA) $319.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chris J Harding

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Lanigan Pruitt